Financial history GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES MODEL ENGINEERING SOCIETY

Charity number: 1179899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/12/2019 30/12/2020 30/12/2021 30/12/2022 30/12/2023
Total gross income £17.82k £14.27k £38.51k £24.36k £17.92k
Total expenditure £20.13k £15.53k £19.39k £47.41k £21.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.50k £16.10k £2.67k N/A