Accounts and annual returns THE BRIT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1182050
Charity reporting is up to date (66 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 April 2025 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 07 April 2025 66 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 March 2024 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 March 2024 60 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 March 2023 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 March 2023 34 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 March 2022 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 March 2022 50 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 February 2021 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 February 2021 25 days late Download Open in new window