Financial history LAMBERT LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity number: 1179057
Charity reporting is overdue by 122 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £1.78k £1.14k £69.85k £159 £0
Total expenditure £460 £140.01k £500 £68.53k £168.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A