Financial history THE MAYOR OF WOLVERHAMPTON'S CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1180065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £37.91k £12.18k £23.86k £17.90k £27.13k
Total expenditure £40.80k £133 £21.12k £17.60k £13.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A