THE CROWN WHARF THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1) PROVIDING AN ACCESSIBLE AND AFFORDABLE PERFORMANCE VENUE, FOR THE RESIDENTS OF STAFFORDSHIRE AND IT'S SURROUNDING COUNTIES. 2) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PERFORMING ARTS, THEATRE, MUSIC, DANCE AND CINEMA TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIAT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 10 January 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT KENNEY | Chair | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Leo Capernaros | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARK CHRISTOPHER DORAN | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JILL HOOD | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|||||
HARRIET LAURA Capernaros | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG JOHN CHESTERS | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.53k | £39.03k | £58.60k | £169.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.58k | £5.48k | £49.74k | £174.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £25.00k | £25.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1) PROVIDING AN ACCESSIBLE AND AFFORDABLE PERFORMANCE VENUE, FOR THE RESIDENTS OF STAFFORDSHIRE AND IT'S SURROUNDING COUNTIES. 2) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PERFORMING ARTS, THEATRE, MUSIC, DANCE AND CINEMA TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Boundary Close
STONE
Staffordshire
ST15 0BA
- Phone:
- 07980591719
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window