CRANBROOK IN BLOOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide floral displays, manage various landscapes (wildflower area, library pond, orchard, roundabout, war memorial area) in and about Cranbrook. Promote floriculture and horticulture with one-day garden safari and one-day Chelsea (Flower Show) Fringe event (Nuts in May). Fundraising with plant sales and participation in Apple Fair.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,320 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 29 June 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA ANN PAGE | Chair | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Alston | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Edward Eastwood | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE JOAN MUMMERY | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gwenneth Catherine Heyking | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET GILLIAN WILLIAMSON | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARIAN CUMBERLAND | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.96k | £14.64k | £12.93k | £11.20k | £15.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.76k | £7.82k | £14.00k | £11.16k | £13.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.50k | N/A | £700 | £1.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08 MAY 2018 AS AMENDED ON 25 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HORTICULTURE AND FLORICULTURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO LIVE IN OR VISIT CRANBROOK BY THE PROVISION OF FLORAL DISPLAYS, SHRUBS AND LANDSCAPES IN PLACES VISIBLE TO THE PUBLIC AND OTHER ACTIVITIES WHICH DIRECTLY PROMOTE HORTICULTURE AND FLORICULTURE FOR THE PUBIC BENEFIIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 PROVIDENCE COTTAGES
ANGLEY ROAD
CRANBROOK
TN17 2HG
- Phone:
- 07780526766
- Email:
- info@cranbrookinbloom.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window