ARROWE PARK HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity number: 512345
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity runs a retail shop in the Arrowe Park Hospital, part of the Wirral NHS Trust, this hospital is host to, and principal beneficiary of the work of the charity. The net incoming resources are committed to the hospital. The level of gifts are dependant on the profits generated by the shop. Apart from the operation of the shop, no find raising events are entered into.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Wirral

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 February 1982: Standard registration
  • 22 November 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 22 November 2024: Funds transferred to 1050469 WIRRAL UNIVERSITY TEACHING HOSPITAL NHS FOUNDATION...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023
Total gross income £856.43k £880.31k £432.82k £534.01k £809.42k
Total expenditure £935.90k £886.10k £409.83k £450.18k £786.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £11.61k £3.34k N/A £10.12k £2
Income - Other trading activities £844.82k £876.97k N/A £523.89k £809.42k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 N/A £2 £3
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A £10.12k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £218.87k £140.64k N/A £0 £31.71k
Expenditure - Raising funds £717.03k £745.46k N/A £450.18k £754.71k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £218.87k £140.64k N/A £0 £31.71k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023
Own use assets £3.53k £11.19k N/A £8.08k £6.87k
Long-term investments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Other assets £294.02k £267.26k N/A £214.25k £259.86k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities £217.43k £204.12k N/A £41.19k £62.57k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 165 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 165 days
Annual return 31 January 2023 18 April 2024 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 18 April 2024 140 days late
Annual return 31 January 2022 08 March 2023 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 08 March 2023 98 days late
Annual return 31 January 2021 27 January 2022 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 27 January 2022 58 days late
Annual return 31 January 2020 22 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 22 November 2020 On Time
Submit annual return Open in new window