Trustees WASHINGTON VILLAGE U3A
Charity Number: 1179094

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek Ginsberg | Chair | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Edwards | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian McIntosh | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Edwards | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Hope | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Baxter | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Stevens | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tania Le Marinel | Trustee | 06 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE PALMER | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Christina Hambley | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
LYN BOSSONS | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA GRAHAM | Trustee | 04 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.