Trustees BRISTOL MEDICO-CHIRURGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1181791
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Prof. Parag Singhal Chair 09 October 2024
INDERSEN JASODADEVI CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: 10 days late
BAPIO FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BRISTOL MEDICO-CHIRURGICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Dr David Baker Trustee 09 October 2024
None on record
Dr Jonathan Pitts-Crick Trustee 13 October 2021
BRISTOL MEDICO-CHIRURGICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Dr Tom Frewin Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
Dr Monika Blackwell Trustee 04 June 2020
None on record
Dr Nabil Al-Jarad Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
Dr PETER KENNETH CARPENTER Trustee 04 June 2018
None on record