CHRISTCHURCH (METHODIST / CHURCH OF ENGLAND ECUMENICAL PARTNERSHIP) CLEVEDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity engages in a range of activities, either on its own or with others, including the celebration of public worship, the teaching of the Christian faith, mission and evangelism, pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved, the provision of facilities with a Christian ethos for the local community and the support of other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
140 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Somerset
Governance
- 19 September 2018: Standard registration
- CHRISTCHURCH CLEVEDON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev CLIVE JOHN JENNINGS | Chair | 11 June 2005 |
|
|
||||
Martin Samuel Spink | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Sutherland | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeff Kirkham | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neville Adams | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Suzanne Kirkham | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
John deBorde | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER PETT | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Katy Emma Dommett | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY PETER ROBERTS | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JESSICA ANNE MCMANUS | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dr RUSSELL GEOFFREY HERBERT | Trustee | 01 September 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £178.10k | £176.39k | £260.16k | £211.37k | £236.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.47k | £185.23k | £175.06k | £218.28k | £256.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 MAY 2018
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE PARTICIPATING CHURCHES. IN ACHIEVING ITS PURPOSE, THE CHARITY WILL ENGAGE IN A RANGE OF ACTIVITIES, EITHER ON ITS OWN OR WITH OTHERS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO): A)THE CELEBRATION OF PUBLIC WORSHIP; B)THE TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; C)MISSION AND EVANGELISM; D)PASTORAL WORK, INCLUDING VISITING THE SICK AND THE BEREAVED; E)THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO) THE ELDERLY, THE YOUNG AND OTHER GROUPS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS; AND F)THE SUPPORT OF OTHER CHARITIES IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christchurch
Chapel Hill
CLEVEDON
BS21 7LL
- Phone:
- 01275872414
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window