Financial history THE CARDIFF BLUES COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1179205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £174.98k £279.40k £345.85k £423.45k £360.35k
Total expenditure £162.53k £96.30k £377.55k £412.25k £413.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A