Trustees WYMONDHAM U3A
Charity number: 1183055

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Barry Dollimore | Chair | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Charles Pickman | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Jacqueline Forsdick | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Denniss | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Marjorie Armour | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Alan Peat | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Briggs | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
STUART GRANVILLE CROWTHER | Trustee | 05 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.