Accounts and annual returns SUFFOLK WEST FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES (CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION)

Charity number: 1179294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 11 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 11 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 04 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 04 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 05 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 05 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 16 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 16 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 07 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 07 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window