Financial history SUFFOLK WEST FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES (CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION)

Charity number: 1179294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £55.46k £36.84k £53.91k £65.10k £58.96k
Total expenditure £64.83k £57.27k £80.49k £87.95k £80.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £2.08k £386 £0 N/A