SUFFOLK WEST FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES (CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing educational opportunities for women through a wide range of activities on issues significant to them and their communities through meetings, events and publications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
420 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Suffolk
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Glavin | Chair | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gill McLay | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ebbens | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Anne Deare | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tina Louise Walker | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Rogers | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mary Lindfield | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
June Anne Bryant | Trustee | 02 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
HILDA JULIE HIGGINS | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
LINDA JOAN GRIDLEY | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE KING | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.46k | £36.84k | £53.91k | £65.10k | £58.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.83k | £57.27k | £80.49k | £87.95k | £80.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £2.08k | £386 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 23 JUL 2018 AMENDED ON 14 APR 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE FEDERATION ARE TO FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE MOVEMENT IN SUFFOLK WEST AND ELSEWHERE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 11
Park Farm Business Centre
Fornham Park
Fornham St. Genevieve
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
Suffolk
- Phone:
- 01284 336645
- Email:
- OFFICE@SWFWI.ORG.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window