Trustees SUFFOLK WEST FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES (CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION)
Charity number: 1179294

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Glavin | Chair | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gill McLay | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ebbens | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Anne Deare | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tina Louise Walker | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Rogers | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mary Lindfield | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
June Anne Bryant | Trustee | 02 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
HILDA JULIE HIGGINS | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
LINDA JOAN GRIDLEY | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE KING | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.