Financial history MOORTOWN WEST COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1185254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £12.57k £9.32k £10.36k £9.83k £23.95k
Total expenditure £5.55k £9.30k £13.52k £6.33k £21.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.25k £8.02k £5.54k £7.98k £954