MOORTOWN WEST COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MWCA provides groups and activities to the community of Moortown West and surrounding areas. We also do events for all the community enhancing community cohesion. We also help improve our local community environment with support from our local council.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £954 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 11 September 2019: CIO registration
- MOORTOWN WEST RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gareth Poole | Chair | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexia Dawson | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Jordan | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Hobdell | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Taylor | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marie Bellhouse | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Hill | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.57k | £9.32k | £10.36k | £9.83k | £23.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.55k | £9.30k | £13.52k | £6.33k | £21.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.25k | £8.02k | £5.54k | £7.98k | £954 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 11 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
3.1 TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF MOORTOWN, LEEDS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. 3.2 IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ESTABLISHED OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 TYNWALD DRIVE
LEEDS
LS17 5DX
- Phone:
- 07504519968
- Email:
- mwca2019@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window