Financial history ASHINGDON AND ROCHFORD U3A

Charity number: 1180576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.05k £4.39k £10.27k £20.93k £21.14k
Total expenditure £19.10k £2.32k £9.02k £21.19k £20.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A