Trustees ASHINGDON AND ROCHFORD U3A
Charity number: 1180576

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Foster | Trustee | 02 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA HINE | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HINE | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Paternoster | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Hill | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Hill | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Stenson | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Noreen Bishop | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Kelly | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Foster | Trustee | 02 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ann Collins | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marion Joan Cain | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
CAROL COLLINS | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carole Diane Edwards | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Joan Horrex | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.