Accounts and annual returns THE NORTH YORKSHIRE AND DISTRICT CHRISTIAN BROADCASTING COUNCIL

Charity number: 512656
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2018 10 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 04 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2016 29 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not Required