Financial history Friends of the Anglican Province of Alexandria

Charity Number: 1181201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £23.68k £18.08k £30.83k £24.66k £66.35k
Total expenditure £24.13k £18.52k £28.45k £26.72k £61.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A