Financial history CHESTERFIELD SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 512769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £14.93k £9.96k £2.03k £6.30k £17.08k
Total expenditure £12.60k £8.23k £2.84k £10.42k £17.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A