Financial history MUSICA SECRETA

Charity number: 1180343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 16/10/2020 16/10/2021 16/10/2022 16/10/2023 16/10/2024
Total gross income £17.46k £8.32k £32.94k £6.92k £31.23k
Total expenditure £28.24k £5.81k £36.58k £8.16k £34.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A