NORTHWESTERN UNIVERSITY (USA) FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Objects of the Charity are: (a) the advancement of learning and education in particular (but without limitation) at or in connection with Northwestern University; (b) such other exclusively charitable purposes under the law of England and Wales as the Trustees may in their absolute discretion determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- United States
Governance
- 03 July 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Allen | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
FAIZA SETH | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Bernard Dalle | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|||||
David Lively | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Lewis Norton | Trustee | 05 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.94k | £208.75k | £258.51k | £292.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £186.32k | £206.70k | £245.11k | £280.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 AUG 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 JUN 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF LEARNING AND EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) AT OR IN CONNECTION WITH NORTHWESTERN UNIVERSITY; AND (B) SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
99 Durlston Road
LONDON
E5 8RP
- Phone:
- 02033808435
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window