Accounts and annual returns CHESTER VISUAL ARTS

Charity number: 1180619
Charity reporting is up to date (65 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 04 May 2025 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 06 September 2024 190 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 21 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 27 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 07 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 30 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 07 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 07 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window