ST EDMUND'S SCOUTS AND GUIDES PARENT'S ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 512858
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide and manage premises and equipment for Scouts and Guides organisation. In addition, to let premises for the use of local community activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Total income: £15,224
Total expenditure: £7,669

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Leeds City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 August 1982: Standard registration
  • 03 October 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 03 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1198104 ST EDMUND'S GUIDE AND SCOUT HEADQUARTERS MANAGEMEN...
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • ST EDMUND'S SCOUT AND GUIDE PARENT'S ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £18.49k £13.95k £13.99k £5.27k £15.22k
Total expenditure £13.64k £7.56k £13.65k £11.46k £7.67k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required