Financial history THE WELSH SCHOOLS' RUGBY UNION

Charity number: 512895
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £181.09k £8.00k £174.99k £180.85k £157.20k
Total expenditure £164.58k £8.47k £129.99k £198.16k £170.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A