Financial history NORFOLK MUSEUM OF FREEMASONRY

Charity number: 1183920
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £10 £0 £700 £6.10k £6.35k
Total expenditure £227 £62 £0 £6.87k £6.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A