Financial history THE FELLMONGERS COMPANY CHARITY

Charity number: 512958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £3.10k £10.75k £10.70k £3.59k £3.11k
Total expenditure £3.01k £1.15k £7.85k £2.72k £4.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A