THE COCKS AND HENS LAWN TENNIS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a tennis club serving people in Cambridge and the surrounding area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 03 April 2019: CIO registration
- COCKS AND HENS CAMBRIDGE TENNIS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON CHARLES ANGUS ELLIOTT | Chair | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Holroyd | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Carl Dunton | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lionel Sheffield | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julija Shabanova | Trustee | 16 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Paul Handy | Trustee | 16 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.30k | £167.08k | £105.88k | £94.81k | £102.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.47k | £130.66k | £61.47k | £70.19k | £86.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.03k | £20.43k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CAMBRIDGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING TENNIS. "FACILITIES" IS DEFINED AS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND THE ORGANISING OF SPORTING ACTIVITY INCLUDING COACHING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7A Barton Road
ELY
Cambridgeshire
CB7 4HZ
- Phone:
- 07720 068 230
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window