SMILEY SMILEY JOSH RILEY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are raising funds in order to purchase a premium lodge(s) in the lake district which we will run and use for cancer patients and their family to go away and relax whilst going through such a difficult time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Riley | Chair | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Aspin | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kristopher Gregory | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hanna Simpson | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.77k | £15.42k | £24.91k | £18.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £239 | £855 | £1.42k | £2.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 03 March 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 03 March 2025 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 05 April 2024 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 05 April 2024 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO THOSE ADULTS AGED BETWEEN 18 AND 40 IN NEED BECAUSE OF ILL-HEALTH AS A RESULT OF CANCER BY: (1)PROVIDING THE OPPORTUNITY TO ENJOY VALUABLE TIME AND BUILD HAPPY MEMORIES FOR PEOPLE WITH A LIFE-LIMITING OR LIFE-THREATENING ILLNESS AND THEIR FAMILIES BY THE PROVISION OF RESPITE ACCOMMODATION; AND (2)MAINTAINING FOR THE PURPOSES OF (1), ABOVE, THE UPKEEP OF THE RESPITE ACCOMMODATION AND ENSURE IT IS CUSTOMISED AND FULLY ACCESSIBLE FOR THOSE BENEFICIARIES WHO MAKE USE OF I
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Aspen Close
BLACKBURN
BB2 5GT
- Phone:
- 07500280297
- Email:
- TEAM@SMILEYSMILEY.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window