Financial history THE COTON GREEN EVANGELICAL FREE CHURCH TRUST FUND

Charity number: 513110
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £335.23k £267.37k £349.63k £252.61k £264.21k
Total expenditure £306.74k £269.29k £311.03k £301.39k £224.51k
Income from government contracts £95.31k N/A N/A £133.23k £3.17k
Income from government grants N/A £114.99k £129.93k £4.66k £3.17k