Trustees SOUTH WOODHAM FERRERS UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1181261

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eileen Drane | Trustee | 18 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Dawn Weaver | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Hayes | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Patricia Kelly | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Alan Gatford | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Frances Woolley | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elizabeth Brindley | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Martin Tyas | Trustee | 04 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Linda Masterson | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mary SMITH | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.