Trustees ENFIELD CROQUET CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1181309
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
FRANK RICHARD PALMER Chair 16 November 2024
None on record
Juan Kim Taylor Trustee 16 November 2024
None on record
Ian Roger Moore Trustee 18 November 2023
None on record
Gillian Mary Porter Trustee 26 November 2022
None on record
Jean Dawes Trustee 20 November 2021
None on record
Thomas John Dixon Halliday Trustee 20 November 2021
None on record
Frances Mary Broadway Trustee 21 November 2020
None on record