UPLYME VILLAGE HALL CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of Uplyme Village Hall for the benefit of the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
- Dorset
Governance
- 20 December 2018: CIO registration
- 20 August 2021: Funds received from 245888 THE UPLYME VILLAGE HALL
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Hackett | Chair | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Oakley | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Simon Prior | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Mary Summers | Trustee | 28 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Margaret Perham | Trustee | 20 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Sarah Foxwell | Trustee | 20 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALAN NABARRO | Trustee | 20 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.03k | £33.27k | £23.97k | £53.41k | £36.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.42k | £17.84k | £23.27k | £30.27k | £56.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.59k | £4.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF UPLYME WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
UPLYME VILLAGE HALL
LYME ROAD
UPLYME
LYME REGIS
DT7 3UY
- Phone:
- 01297444303
- Email:
- uplymevh@gmail.com
- Website:
-
uplymevillage.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window