AT THE BUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AT The Bus offers a school-based programme of art as therapy to support the education, health and wellbeing of children and young people aged 5-16 in Oxfordshire and London. Group sessions take place during the school day in a purposely designed therapeutic studio space in a double decker bus located on school grounds or in specially designed studio spaces.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £5,000 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kensington And Chelsea
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 20 December 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deryn Mary Harvey | Chair | 12 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Mannix | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Bernadette Gloria Olabisi Lowe | Trustee | 12 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Jones | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nelly-Sabine Rachel Cecile de Rothschild Munthe | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susanna Rose Lawson | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £199.91k | £113.76k | £250.79k | £318.29k | £282.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.85k | £96.73k | £225.37k | £277.67k | £288.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.44k | £2.60k | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND MENTAL WELLBEING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE EXPERIENCING EMOTIONAL, BEHAVIOURAL AND OTHER CHALLENGES AND COMPLEX NEEDS BY PROVIDING ART-AS-THERAPY PROGRAMMES THAT, AMONGST OTHER THINGS, PROMOTE ENGAGEMENT WITH LEARNING AND INCLUSION IN SCHOOLS AND COMMUNITIES, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING TRAINING AND SUPPORT FOR THOSE WHO WORK WITH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE EXPERIENCING CHALLENGES IN THEIR LIVES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
AT The Bus
c/o New Marston Primary School
Copse Lane
Headington
OXFORD
OX3 0AY
- Phone:
- 07305084218
- Email:
- info@atthebus.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window