FRIENDS OF COTTERIDGE PARK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE THROUGH THE PROMOTION, SUPPORT AND IMPROVEMENT OF COTTERIDGE PARK AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL, CREATIVE AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £9,320 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 21 January 2019: CIO registration
- 31 October 2020: Funds received from 1150091 FRIENDS OF COTTERIDGE PARK
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Billups | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Wallis | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Lloyd | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Kay Little | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jason Paul Willetts | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Mather | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Laura Brooks | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cathal Lynch | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
EMMA WOOLF MBE | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Carola Lange | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Max Woolf | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.62k | £157.36k | £77.89k | £124.16k | £138.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.79k | £214.88k | £50.71k | £92.00k | £129.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.22k | £9.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE SURROUNDING AREA OF COTTERIDGE PARK AND VISITORS TO THE AREA ("THE BENEFICIARIES"), THE PROMOTION OF THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE BENEFICIARIES WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) THE PROMOTION, SUPPORT AND IMPROVEMENT OF COTTERIDGE PARK. B) ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL, CREATIVE AND OTHER ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, PRIMARILY IN AND AROUND THE PARK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Shed
Cotteridge Park
Franklin Road
Birmingham
- Phone:
- 01214512336
- Email:
- info@cotteridgepark.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window