Financial history CHILTERN FOODBANK

Charity number: 1181094
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £144.17k £434.70k £264.00k £434.01k £365.56k
Total expenditure £112.27k £326.72k £184.10k £250.64k £319.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants £12.00k £43.14k £31.61k £5.75k £12.88k