Financial history STORMBREAK CIO

Charity number: 1182771
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £93.36k £135.53k £414.94k £530.97k £440.41k
Total expenditure £44.26k £145.76k £230.16k £486.88k £388.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £74.81k £132.00k £78.00k
Income from government grants £50.25k £1.50k £32.00k £3.19k £37.92k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £410.77k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £120.20k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £474.51k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £12.37k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £16.15k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A