TRINITY BAPTIST CHURCH GLOUCESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's activities involve the advancement of the Christian faith primarily, but not exclusively within Gloucester and the surrounding neighbourhood in accordance with the Charity's Basis of Faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Philip Harding | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Charles Pearce | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Gamston | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Mark Reeves | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
Martin Stuart Gamston | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Hurcum | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
Dr THOMAS ALAN GILMORE | Trustee | 05 July 2001 |
|
|||||
Richard John Graves | Trustee | 01 April 1994 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £150.10k | £188.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £183.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 February 2023 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 February 2023 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 12 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
3.1 THE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE: 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN GLOUCESTER AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHURCH’S BASIS OF FAITH (AS OUTLINED IN APPENDIX 1) AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH BIBLICAL AND BAPTISTIC PRINCIPLES INCLUDING THAT: I) OUR LORD AND SAVIOUR JESUS CHRIST, GOD MANIFEST IN THE FLESH, IS THE SOLE AND ABSOLUTE AUTHORITY IN ALL MATTERS OF FAITH AND PRACTICE, AS REVEALED IN THE HOLY SCRIPTURES, AND THAT EACH CHURCH HAS LIBERTY, UNDER THE GUIDANCE OF THE HOLY SPIRIT, TO INTERPRET AND ADMINISTER HIS LAWS. II) BAPTISM IS THE IMMERSION IN WATER, INTO THE NAME OF THE FATHER, THE SON AND THE HOLY SPIRIT, OF THOSE WHO CREDIBLY PROFESS REPENTANCE TOWARD GOD AND FAITH IN THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AS A SYMBOL OF THEIR UNION WITH CHRIST AND ENTRY INTO HIS CHURCH III) IT IS THE DUTY OF EVERY DISCIPLE TO BEAR PERSONAL WITNESS TO THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST, AND TO TAKE PART IN EVANGELISATION OF THE WORLD. 3.1.2 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES, PUT INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; PROVIDED THAT THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH PURPOSES MUST BE UNDERTAKEN IN A MANNER THAT IS CONSISTENT WITH THE DOCTRINAL DISTINCTIVES AND ETHICAL STATEMENTS AS MAY BE ADOPTED AND AMENDED BY THE CHURCH FROM TIME TO TIME IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF THE CHURCH HANDBOOK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FINLAY ROAD
GLOUCESTER
GL4 6SE
- Phone:
- 01452416532
- Email:
- secretary@tbcgloucester.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window