LAKES SCHOOL COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Full details of current activities are shown on LSCP Facebook page and Lakes School Web page
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cumbria
Governance
- 30 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Ingham | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY ELIZABETH HOGG | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Belshaw | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paula Bailey | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Beverly Palmer | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.18k | £2 | £1 | £217 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.69k | £500 | £123 | £390 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF THE LAKES SCHOOL IN WINDERMERE IN PARTICULAR BY ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES AND PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT (NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) THAT WILL SUPPORT AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
B W C C T
THE PHOENIX CENTRE
PHOENIX WAY
WINDERMERE
LA23 1BZ
- Phone:
- 01539445117
- Email:
- phoenixwindermere@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window