Trustees CLEVELAND COUNTY GUIDES
Charity number: 513343

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Cox | Chair | 29 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine York | Trustee | 05 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY JANE MAGSON | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Clair Heward | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Helen Elizabeth Richardson | Trustee | 04 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Cornelius | Trustee | 04 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Pearce | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Ann Jones | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Louise Williams | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jane Hill | Trustee | 11 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Christine Hermon | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Ward | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Wright | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.