THE RAP FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of workshops and presentations to young people, on a range of issues relating to relationships and sex education so that they are better able to make their own informed decisions about their relationships, behaviour, actions and safety.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 July 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracey J Marshall | Chair | 24 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Judith Elizabeth Prinsley | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara Gordon | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
LEO CREMONEZI | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deana Puccio | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Astley Patricia Therese | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dumbell Annabel Jane | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.90k | £18.07k | £33.77k | £36.35k | £15.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £396 | £6.71k | £33.60k | £31.88k | £32.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 February 2021 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS AND PRESENTATIONS IN THE SUBJECT OF RELATIONSHIP AND SEX EDUCATION SO THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO MAKE THEIR OWN INFORMED DECISIONS ABOUT THEIR RELATIONSHIPS, BEHAVIOUR, ACTIONS AND SAFETY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fisher Phillips Llp
Summit House
170 Finchley Road
LONDON
- Phone:
- 07771616546
- Email:
- info@therapfoundation.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window