Financial history CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY CATHOLIC ASSOCIATION CIO

Charity number: 1184835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £225.79k £194.18k £361.33k £390.60k £388.64k
Total expenditure £209.19k £223.30k £218.89k £225.33k £351.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A