Trustees ANOTHER WAY

Charity number: 1181438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Ratcliffe Chair 18 March 2019
None on record
Emily Dresser Trustee 14 March 2025
None on record
Robyn Riddoch Trustee 14 March 2025
None on record
Damian Smith Trustee 10 March 2025
None on record
Seth Campbell Trustee 22 July 2024
None on record
Roseanne Serrelli Trustee 07 February 2024
CHIGWELL SCHOOL
Received: On time
Sara Chandran Trustee 07 February 2024
None on record
Ceri Rachel Holman Trustee 12 May 2023
None on record