Trustees MALMESBURY AND DISTRICT U3A
Charity number: 1181790

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yvonne Louise Mockridge | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diana Beryl D'Arcy | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Cole | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Nigel Burns | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aileen Hood | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Gough | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Davies | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Gee | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Stephen Fairhurst | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr RICHARD GRAY | Trustee | 23 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Jane Sara Gray | Trustee | 23 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.