ENGAGE WTH CHINA LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provison of 1 day workshops for primary & secondary state schools in the UK on Modern China
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 18 October 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 August 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gareth Edward Doodes | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles David Aykeroyd Collins | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Amanda Jane Mellor | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Graham Batey OBE | Trustee | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Colquhoun Cole-Fontayn | Trustee | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
THERESA MARGARET BOOTH | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Helen-Jane Colston-Inge | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 18/10/2020 | 18/10/2021 | 18/10/2022 | 18/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.54k | £8.54k | £10.07k | £49.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.94k | £4.94k | £10.26k | £25.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 October 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 October 2023 | 03 October 2024 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 October 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 October 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 October 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 OCT 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07 AUG 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN CHINESE HISTORY, CULTURE AND HERITAGE THROUGH (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH) PROVIDING:- 1. INTERACTIVE, ON SITE CLASSROOM SESSIONS DESIGNED TO BUILD CULTURAL INTELLIGENCE ON MODERN CHINA, INCLUDING ITS HISTORY, CULTURE AND CURRENT INFLUENCE ON THE UNITED KINGDOM; 2. WEB-BASED RESOURCES; AND 3. MUSICAL EVENTS TO STATE SCHOOL CHILDREN IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHICH AIM TO TEACH AND INSPIRE CURIOSITY ABOUT CHINA AND RELATED GLOBAL CAREER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN IN STATE SCHOOLS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 Gloucester Terrace
LONDON
W2 3HH
- Phone:
- 02077064713
- Email:
- china.t@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window