LICHFIELD RE:CYCLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bicycle recycling and confidence building, skill sharing demonstrations based at Curborough Community Centre in Lichfield with outreach across the Lichfield District. Bikes available for beneficiaries on free long term loan. Social rides and events to encourage participation in cycling.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 11 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Covey | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Howard Hill | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Miller | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip James Pendlebury | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Edmund Strain | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Diane Harrison | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brett Jones | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Flintham | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan Scott Richardson | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.98k | £7.97k | £3.45k | £3.10k | £1.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.61k | £8.49k | £3.37k | £3.77k | £2.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF STAFFORDSHIRE BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECYCLING UNWANTED BICYCLES TO ENABLE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY TO LOAN THE BICYCLES FREE OF CHARGE AND ALSO THE ORGANISATION OF BICYCLE RIDES, OTHER SOCIAL EVENTS AND BICYCLE MAINTENANCE WORKSHOPS FOR MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY TO ATTEND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Curborough Community Centre
Reynolds Close
LICHFIELD
Staffordshire
WS13 7NY
- Phone:
- 07948172097
- Website:
-
lichfieldrecycle.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window