Accounts and annual returns Lancashire Mining Museum Limited

Charity number: 513511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 06 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 06 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 18 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 18 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 01 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 01 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 23 May 2022 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 23 May 2022 23 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 19 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window